EP4132060 - TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Mingju No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20928637.6 | 03.04.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN83322 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196214 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132060 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L5/00, H04B7/024, H04W72/232 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/06] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | Translation filed | 02.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2020037305 (YANG WEI [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14,15 * paragraphs [0112] , [0140] - [0151] - [0156] - [0162]; figure 4 * [Y] 4-13; | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Multi-TRP Enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1911126 MULTI-TRP ENHANCEMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1911126.zip, (20191005), XP051789902 [Y] 4-9 * Section 3; page 6 - page 18 * | [Y] - HUAWEI HISILICON, "Feature Summary of Enhancements on Multi-TRP/Panel Transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191022), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1911425_FLSUMMARY_MTRP_98BIS_V2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1911425.zip, (20191022), XP051798694 [Y] 10-13 * pages 2-3 * * page 52 - page 53 * | [Y] - OPPO, "Enhancements on multi-TRP and multi-panel transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191108), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1911843, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_99/Docs/R1-1911843.zip, (20191108), XP051819864 [Y] 7-9 * page 6 * | International search | [A]CN104488320 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]US2018254863 (CHOI KUKHEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN108809480 (DATANG MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * description paragraphs [0098]-[0204] *; | [A]CN109274470 (SHENZHEN GIONEE COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A] - Intel Corporation, "On multi-TRP/multi-panel transmission", 3GPP Draft; R1-1910668_r2, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20191005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, XP051789460 [A] 1-32 * entire document * |