EP4129225 - OPERATION PLAN DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SceneRay Co., Ltd. Building C16, 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states Suzhou Sceneray Co., Ltd. C16. BioBay NO. 218 Xinghu St. Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lei C16. BioBay, NO. 218 Xinghu St., Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 02 /
HE, Xiaofeng C16. BioBay, NO. 218 Xinghu St., Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20929458.6 | 14.12.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN136056 | Priority number, date | CN202010242373 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010242373 | [2023/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196731 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129225 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/10, A61B34/20 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61B34/10 (EP,CN);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B90/10 (CN);
A61B90/37 (CN);
G01R33/5608 (EP);
G06T5/50 (EP);
A61B2034/102 (EP);
A61B2034/107 (EP,CN);
A61B2034/108 (CN);
A61B2034/2065 (CN);
A61B2090/101 (CN);
A61B2090/374 (CN);
A61B2090/3762 (CN);
G01R33/56341 (EP);
G06T2207/10088 (EP);
G06T2207/10092 (EP);
G06T2207/20221 (EP);
G06T2207/30016 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES BETRIEBSPLANS UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/06] | English: | OPERATION PLAN DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE PLAN D'OPÉRATION, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2022 | Translation filed | 06.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2008064947 (HERUTH KENNETH T [US], et al); | [XAYI]US2019108638 (ZAGORCHEV LYUBOMIR GEORGIEV [US], et al); |