EP4133775 - CROSS-LINK INTERFERENCE MEASUREMENT CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Huilin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
MA, Ruifeng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20929776.1 | 10.04.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN84191 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203410 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133775 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08, H04W24/02, H04W24/10, // H04W56/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (US);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04W56/0045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04W24/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSÜBERGREIFENDE INTERFERENZMESSUNGSKONFIGURATION | [2023/07] | English: | CROSS-LINK INTERFERENCE MEASUREMENT CONFIGURATION | [2023/07] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE MESURE D'INTERFÉRENCE DE LIAISON TRANSVERSALE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP3567759 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,15-17 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0193] * * paragraph [0222] - paragraph [0226] * * paragraph [0233] * [A] 6,9-14 [I] 3-5,7,8; | [E]WO2021138827 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [E] 1,15-17 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0100]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0137] *; | [E]EP3930367 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [E] 1,15-17* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figure 2 *; | [XA] - NOKIA ET AL, "On Cross-link interference measurement framework", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170917), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715747 ON CROSS-LINK INTERFERENCE MEASUREMENT FRAMEWORK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170917), XP051339209 [X] 1,2,15-17 * page 2 - page 4 * [A] 6,9-14 | [XA] - ERICSSON, "Remaining issues for RIM/CLI", vol. RAN WG2, no. Online; 20200420 - 20200430, (20200409), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-2003380, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_109bis-e/Docs/R2-2003380.zip R2-2003380 - Remaining issues for CLI.docx, (20200409), XP052354346 [X] 1,2,15-17 * page 4 * [A] 6,9-14 | International search | [A]US2018323916 (YANG WEIDONG [US], et al) [A] 1-132 * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0065] *; | [A]CN108809577 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-132 * the whole document *; | [A]CN109391995 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-132* the whole document *; | [A]CN110383722 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-132 * the whole document *; | [A]CN110896562 (RES INST CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CORP, et al) [A] 1-132 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2018323916 | CN108809577 | CN109391995 | CN110383722 | CN110896562 |