EP4133875 - COMMUNICATION CONFIGURATION BASED ON RANDOM ACCESS BANDWIDTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
XU, Changlong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20930098.7 | 10.04.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN84133 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203402 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133875 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W72/0453 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/14 (KR);
H04W72/0457 (KR);
H04W72/231 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSKONFIGURATION BASIEREND AUF ZUFALLSZUGRIFFSBANDBREITE | [2023/07] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONFIGURATION BASED ON RANDOM ACCESS BANDWIDTH | [2023/07] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE COMMUNICATION BASÉE SUR UNE BANDE PASSANTE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO2019074338 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 9 [Y] 4,11 [I] 5,8,12,13; | [X]WO2019160481 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,6,9,14,15 * figure 15 * * page 35, lines 15-23 *; | [YA]WO2019193422 (LENOVO SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 67] *[A] 1-10,12-15; | [YA]WO2020034550 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 4 * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 7 * [A] 1-3,5-15; | US2020266959 [ ] (YI YUNJUNG [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0072] , [ 112] , [ 114] , [ 123] , [ 127] , [ 167] * | International search | [A]WO2016065640 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-103 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016295609 (VAJAPEYAM MADHAVAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [A] 1-103 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018310341 (YERRAMALLI SRINIVAS [US], et al) [A] 1-103 * description, paragraphs [0034]-[0140] *; | [A] - Huawei; HiSilicon, "Configuration of coverage enhancement during initial access", 3GPP Draft; R1-150035, Athens, Greece, (20150131), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 7, XP050948800 [A] 1-103 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2019074388 | WO2019160481 |