EP4142039 - SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jong-Ha 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 02 /
CHUN, Byoungmin 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 20932441.7 | 01.12.2020 | [2023/09] | WO2020KR17371 | Priority number, date | KR20200048221 | 21.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200048221 | [2023/09] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215612 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142039 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/543, H01M50/572, H01M50/147, H01M50/183, H01M10/04 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H01M50/109 (EP);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M50/147 (KR,US);
H01M10/04 (KR);
H01M10/0427 (KR);
H01M50/153 (EP,KR);
H01M50/183 (KR);
H01M50/188 (EP,US);
H01M50/559 (EP);
H01M50/562 (EP);
H01M50/572 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/09] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/09] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2022 | Translation filed | 15.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]KR100357957B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) [X] 1-4,6-15 * See page 3 and figure 2. * [Y] 5; | [A]US8389163 (TAKEZAWA HIDEHARU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. *; | [A]JP2013161584 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20140081105 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See entire document. *; | [Y]JP2016173976 (FDK ENERGY CO LTD) [Y] 5 * See paragraphs [0039], [0040] and [0044] and figures 1-8B. * |