EP4135456 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING MULTIPLE RESOURCE CONFLICTS AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, BG, ES, FI, GR, HR, NL, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Zhe No.18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20932549.7 | 21.04.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN85997 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021212346 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135456 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4135456 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/563, // H04W72/23 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04W72/563 (EP,KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (KR);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04W72/569 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04W72/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEHRERER RESSOURCENKONFLIKTE UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/07] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING MULTIPLE RESOURCE CONFLICTS AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CONFLITS DE RESSOURCES MULTIPLES, ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2022 | Translation filed | 09.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NOKIA ET AL, "Analysis of Intra-UE Data Prioritization Schemes", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, NV, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190502), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1906187 ANALYSIS OF INTRA-UE DATA PRIORITIZATION SCHEMES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F106/Docs/R2%2D1906187%2Ezip, (20190502), XP051710512 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * | [X] - SAMSUNG, "Report of [Offline-036][IIOT] Data Data and Data SR prioritization", vol. RAN WG2, no. 20200224 - 20200306, (20200311), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-2002190, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_109_e/Docs/R2-2002190.zip R2-2002190 O036 Summary_Ph3_r2_clean.doc, (20200311), XP051864722 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [2.2.2] * * paragraph [2.2.5] * | [X] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Open issues in Intra-UE prioritization", vol. RAN WG2, no. 20200224 - 20200306, (20200214), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-2001289, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_109_e/Docs/R2-2001289.zip R2-2001289 Open issues in Intra-UE prioritization.doc, (20200214), XP051849597 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [02.2] * * paragraph [02.9] - paragraph [0003] * | [X] - ASUSTEK, "Prioritization between CG and uplink grant for Msg3 or MSGA payload", vol. RAN WG2, no. Online Meeting ;20200420 - 20200430, (20200410), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-2003647, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_109bis-e/Docs/R2-2003647.zip R2-2003647 Prioritization between CG and uplink grant for Msg3 or MSGA payload.docx, (20200410), XP051871550 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [5.4.1] * | International search | [X]WO2019095112 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [X] 1, 18, 35, 52 * claims 1-58 *; | [X]WO2019162929 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1, 18, 35, 52 * claims 1-24 *; | [A]CN110249671 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-52* entire document *; | [A]CN110636626 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-52 * entire document *; | [X] - ASUSTeK, "Prioritization between CG and uplink grant for Msg3 or MSGA payload", 3GPP Draft; R2-2003647, (20200410), vol. RAN WG2, pages 1 - 6, XP051871550 [X] 1-52 * section 2 * |