EP4145925 - MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XING, Jinqiang Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20932970.5 | 30.04.2020 | [2023/10] | WO2020CN88520 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217668 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145925 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/0628 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | MEHRTRÄGERKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2023/10] | English: | MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MULTI-PORTEUSES, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2022 | Translation filed | 29.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2018063693 (CHAKRABORTY KAUSHIK [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0081] * [A] 6,7,13,14 [I] 2-5,9-12; | [X]CN110365459 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0213] *; | [A]US2020037176 (SHA XIUBIN [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0086] ** paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0152] *; | [E]EP4132154 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [E] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049] * | International search | [X]CN102474758 (SHARP KK) [X] 12-13, 36-37, 74-75, 77-87 * description, paragraphs 0103-108, figure 8 *; | [A]WO2017199219 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-87 * entire document *; | [A]CN109698739 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-87* entire document *; | [X] - Samsung, "Discussion on cross-carrier beam management", 3GPP Draft; R1-1715963, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20170917), vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, XP051339422 [X] 1-11, 17-35, 39-44, 50-51, 55-67, 77-87 * section 2 * |