EP4144207 - AQUEOUS EMULSION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING HUANGLONGBING OF CITRUS FRUIT TREES AS WELL AS PREPARATION METHOD AND USAGE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhuhai Runnong Science and Technology Co., Ltd. Room 103, Building 6 No. 2, Hagongda Road Tangjiawan Town High-Tech Zone Zhuhai, Guangdong 519000 / CN | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Xiaoming Zhuhai, Guangdong 519000 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Dianxian Zhuhai, Guangdong 519000 / CN | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 20933570.2 | 13.05.2020 | [2023/10] | WO2020CN89891 | Priority number, date | CN202010365242 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010365242 | [2023/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217721 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144207 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01G17/00, A01G13/00, A01N25/04, A01N43/90, A01N43/16, A01N65/14, A01N65/16, A01N65/26, A01N31/02, A01N25/02, C05C11/00, C05G3/00, C05G3/50, C05G3/60, C05G5/27 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A01P1/00 (EP);
A01N25/04 (EP,CN,US);
C05G3/50 (EP,CN,US);
A01N25/00 (EP);
A01N25/02 (EP);
A01N31/02 (EP,CN,US);
A01N43/16 (CN,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,CN,US);
A01N65/14 (EP);
A01N65/16 (EP);
A01N65/26 (EP);
C05C11/00 (CN,US);
C05F11/02 (EP,CN,US);
C05F11/10 (EP);
C05G3/00 (CN);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/00, A01N31/02, A01N43/16, A01N43/90, A01N65/08 (EP);
A01N25/02, A01N31/02, A01N43/16 (EP);
A01N25/02, A01N31/02, A01N43/90 (EP);
A01N25/02, A01N31/02, A01N65/14 (EP);
A01N25/02, A01N31/02, A01N65/16 (EP);
A01N25/02, A01N31/02, A01N65/26 (EP);
A01N25/04, A01N31/02, A01N31/02, A01N43/16 (CN);
A01N25/04, A01N31/02, A01N31/02, A01N43/16, A01N43/90 (CN);
A01N25/04, A01N31/02, A01N31/02, A01N43/90 (CN);
A01N25/04, A01N31/02, A01N43/16, A01N43/90, A01N65/08 (EP);
A01N31/02, A01N31/02, A01N43/16, A01N43/90, A01N65/08 (EP);
A01N43/90, A01N43/16, A01N65/08 (EP);
C05C11/00, C05G3/00, C05G3/50, C05G3/60, C05G5/27 (CN);
C05F11/02, C05F11/10, C05G3/60 (EP);
C05F11/02, C05G3/00, C05G3/50, C05G3/60, C05G5/27 (CN);
C05F11/02, C05G3/60 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/10] | A01G17/00, A01G13/00, A01N25/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE EMULSION ZUR PRÄVENTION UND BEHANDLUNG VON HUANGLONGBING VON ZITRUSFRUCHTBÄUMEN SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/10] | English: | AQUEOUS EMULSION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING HUANGLONGBING OF CITRUS FRUIT TREES AS WELL AS PREPARATION METHOD AND USAGE METHOD | [2023/10] | French: | ÉMULSION AQUEUSE POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DU HUANGLONGBING D'ARBRES À AGRUMES AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | Translation filed | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 19.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN104823626 (YANG ZHENGTING, et al); | [A]CN105994378 (SICHUAN FENGCHENG MODERN AGRICULTURAL SCIENCE AND TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN108496993 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD); | [Y]CN108530165 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109769550 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD); | [Y]CN109924057 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD) | International search | [Y]CN104823626 (YANG ZHENGTING, et al) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0027]-[0092] *; | [A]CN109769550 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN109769538 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [Y]CN109924057 (ZHUHAI RUNNONG TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0016]-[0030] * |