EP4033322 - SENSING SYSTEM, SENSING DATA ACQUISITION METHOD, AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rakuten Group, Inc. 1-14-1 Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAZAWA, Mitsuru Tokyo 1580094 / JP | 02 /
TAKIZAWA, Jun Chino-shi Nagano 3910301 / JP | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20934878.8 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020JP44196 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022113260 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033322 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G01M99/00, G01C21/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G05D1/0094 (EP);
G05D1/12 (US);
A01G25/167 (EP,US);
B64C39/024 (US);
G01C11/02 (EP);
G05D1/0044 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G05D1/101 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V20/17 (US);
G06V20/188 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
B64U2101/30 (US);
G06T2207/10032 (US);
G06T2207/30188 (US);
G06V2201/07 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | MESSSYSTEM, MESSDATENERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/30] | English: | SENSING SYSTEM, SENSING DATA ACQUISITION METHOD, AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2022/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION, PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION DE DONNÉES DE DÉTECTION, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2021 | Translation filed | 16.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2002168623 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [X] 1,3,6,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] *[I] 2,4,5,8 | International search | [Y]JPH0659733 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS) [Y] 11-12 * paragraph [0008] *; | [A]JP2013230088 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0021]-[0025] *; | [Y]US2016216245 (SUTTON BRIAN HAROLD [US]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0050]-[0054] *; | [Y]JP2018021865 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0053]-[0055]; [0094]; [0103]-[0136]; [0148]-[0149] *; | [Y]US2018156770 (SAEZ ORLANDO [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0047] * | by applicant | JP2011254711 |