EP4133764 - REPORTING SUPPORTED COMPONENT CARRIERS FOR PHYSICAL DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL MONITORING CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Hong Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Dawei Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
XU, Fangli Beijing 100022 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Haitong Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
CUI, Jie Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
OTERI, Oghenekome San Diego, California 92131 / US | 07 /
ZENG, Wei Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 08 /
YANG, Weidong San Diego, California 92131 / US | 09 /
TANG, Yang Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 10 /
YAO, Chunhai Beijing 100022 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20935602.1 | 03.06.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN94182 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN90266 | 14.05.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/090266 | WO2020CN90316 | 14.05.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/090316 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021227152 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133764 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, // H04L5/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W8/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04W8/22, H04W24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | MELDUNG UNTERSTÜTZTER KOMPONENTENTRÄGER FÜR ÜBERWACHUNGSFÄHIGKEITEN EINES PHYSIKALISCHEN DOWNLINK-STEUERKANALS | [2023/07] | English: | REPORTING SUPPORTED COMPONENT CARRIERS FOR PHYSICAL DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL MONITORING CAPABILITIES | [2023/07] | French: | RAPPORT DE PORTEUSES COMPOSANTES PRISES EN CHARGE POUR DES CAPACITÉS DE SURVEILLANCE DE CANAL PHYSIQUE DE CONTRÔLE DESCENDANT | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2020072963 (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 2-5,11-14* paragraphs [0047] , [0050] *; | [E]WO2021163061 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0062] - [0084]; figure 4 *; | [Y] - APPLE INC, "Remaining Issues on PDCCH Enhancements for eURLLC", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200420 - 20200430, (20200411), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2002329, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_100b_e/Docs/R1-2002329.zip R1-2002329 Remaining Issues on PDCCH Enhancements for eURLLC.docx, (20200411), XP051875549 [Y] 1-15 * page 5 * | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 12)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160330), vol. RAN WG2, no. V12.9.0, pages 1 - 456, XP051088478 [Y] 1-15 * page 122 * | International search | [A]US2019349155 (XU HUILIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]CN110620645 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0086] *; | [A]WO2020072963 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - ZTE, "On PDCCH enhancements for NR URLLC", 3GPP Draft; R1-1911963, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20191109), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, XP051823144 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2020072963 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 12", 3GPP TS 36.331 |