EP4076965 - CAPPING STATIONS WITH POSITIONING MECHANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ TAPIA, Jose Antonio 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 02 /
ANGULO NAVARRO, Emilio 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 03 /
LOPEZ UBIETO, Diego 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 20936208.6 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US33593 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021236065 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076965 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B41J2/16508 (EP);
B41J2/16511 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | VERSCHLIESSSTATIONEN MIT POSITIONIERUNGSMECHANISMEN | [2022/43] | English: | CAPPING STATIONS WITH POSITIONING MECHANISMS | [2022/43] | French: | STATIONS DE RECOUVREMENT DOTÉES DE MÉCANISMES DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5325111 (DIETL STEVEN J [US]) [X] 1-3,7,12 * column 5, line 5 - line 22; figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 35 - line 36 * [I] 4-6,8-11,13-15; | [A]US5953024 (LEE YONG-DUK [KR], et al) [A] 7 * column 4, line 14 - line 18 *; | [A]US6568787 (GIRONES XAVIER [ES], et al) [A] 10,11* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2007103504 (HUANG SHR-HOW [TW]) [X] 1,7 * figures 1-10 * [A] 12-15 [I] 2-6,8-11 | International search | [XYA]US5325111 (DIETL STEVEN J [US]) [X] 1-3, 12 * , col. 1 lines 7-8, col. 5 lines 9-22, 24-25, 36-41, 44-68, col. 6 lines 1-4, fig. 2 col. 1 lines 7-8, KOJI. 2 lines 41-43, 60-63, col. 4 lines 53-56, col. 5 lines 5-7, 9-22, 24-25, 32-36, fig. 2-3 * [Y] 7, 10, 11 [A] 4-6, 8, 9, 13-15; | [Y]US5953024 (LEE YONG-DUK [KR], et al) [Y] 7, 10, 11 * , col. 4 lines 14-18 *; | [A]US6520621 (ECKARD B MICHAEL [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [Y]US6568787 (GIRONES XAVIER [ES], et al) [Y] 10, 11 * , col. 3 line 59 * |