EP4161114 - IMS REGISTRATION METHOD, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRD Communication (Shenzhen) Ltd 8/F Block F4 TCL Communication Technology Building TCL International E City 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Kai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Lina Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | 03 /
LI, Tao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Fan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20938040.1 | 04.08.2020 | [2023/14] | WO2020CN106898 | Priority number, date | CN202010453368 | 26.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010453368 | [2023/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021237936 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161114 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/1016, H04L65/1073, H04W60/00, H04W8/18 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H04L65/1073 (EP);
H04W8/183 (CN);
H04L65/1016 (EP,CN);
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04L65/65 (EP);
H04W60/00 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | H04W8/18, H04W60/00, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | IMS-REGISTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHES ENDGERÄT | [2023/14] | English: | IMS REGISTRATION METHOD, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT IMS, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET TERMINAL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2022 | Translation filed | 16.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010329243 (BUCKLEY ADRIAN [US], et al); | [XDI]CN107579945 (CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CO LTD RES INSTITUTE, et al) |