EP4157341 - PEPTIDES FOR COVID-19 PREVENTION AND TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sotira Covid, LLC 2525 E Camelback Rd., Suite 800 Phoenix, AZ 85016 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY, Avik Phoenix, Arizona 85016 / US | 02 /
GOTTSCHALK, Carl Phoenix, Arizona 85016 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20938310.8 | 07.10.2020 | [2023/14] | WO2020US54643 | Priority number, date | US202063031530P | 28.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063031530 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021242294 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157341 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, C07K14/165, C12N15/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2770/20022 (EP,US);
C12N2770/20033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | PEPTIDE ZUR COVID-19-PRÄVENTION UND -BEHANDLUNG | [2023/14] | English: | PEPTIDES FOR COVID-19 PREVENTION AND TREATMENT | [2023/14] | French: | PEPTIDES POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE LA COVID-19 | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011236411 (SCHOLLER JOERGEN [DK], et al); | [Y]US2016031972 (ZHENG ZIZHENG [CN], et al); |