EP4133718 - OPTIMAL VIEW SELECTION IN A TELECONFERENCING SYSTEM WITH CASCADED CAMERAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/52] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | ||
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states Plantronics, Inc. 345 Encinal Street Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Yongkang Beijing 100027 / CN | 02 /
XU, Hai Beijing 100027 / CN | 03 /
HE, Wenxue Beijing 100027 / CN | 04 /
SONG, Hailin Beijing 100027 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Tianran Beijing 100027 / CN | 06 /
LU, Xi Beijing 100027 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20939092.1 | 04.06.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN94294 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021243633 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133718 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H04N7/147 (EP);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V40/161 (EP);
G10L25/78 (US);
H04N7/15 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | OPTIMALE ANSICHTSAUSWAHL IN EINEM TELEKONFERENZSYSTEM MIT KASKADIERTEN KAMERAS | [2023/07] | English: | OPTIMAL VIEW SELECTION IN A TELECONFERENCING SYSTEM WITH CASCADED CAMERAS | [2023/07] | French: | SÉLECTION DE VUE OPTIMALE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCONFÉRENCE À CAMÉRAS EN CASCADE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 22.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 12.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005328461 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 2-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 17] - [0019] *; | [Y]JP2013254999 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 2-4,9-11* paragraph [0054] *; | [XYI]US2018249124 (TANGELAND KRISTIAN [NO], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 13] - [0020] - [0 26] , [0 29] , [0 37] , [0 38] * [Y] 2-4,9-11 [I] 5-7,12-14; | [XYI]US10447970 (CHU PETER L [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * column 3, lines 43,44 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, lines 12-54 * * column 6, lines 1-16 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 15 * [Y] 2-4,9-11 [I] 5-7,12-14; | [Y] - Andrej Popescu-Belis, "Machine Learning for Multimodal Interaction", Proc. of 5th MLMI workshop, Internet, (20080910), pages 109 - 120, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/978-3-540-85853-9.pdf, (20190117), XP055543840 [Y] 2-4,9-11 * paragraph [3. Virtual Video Director] * | International search | [Y]US2011285808 (FENG JINWEI [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * description, paragraphs 0037-0046 *; | [A]WO2012161089 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]KR101508092B (CENT INTEGRATED SMART SENSORS FOUND) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y]CN105611167 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 1-21 * description, paragraphs 0053, 0063-0066 *; | [A]US2017133036 (COHEN AZARIA [IL], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107613243 (SHENZHEN SONICAM AUDIO AND VIDEO TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |