EP4162921 - WATER-DISPERSIBLE COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR ULTRAVIOLET BLOCKING CONTAINING INORGANIC THICKENER AND ORGANIC THICKENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd. 12-11 Deokgogae-gil Jeonui-myeon Sejong 30004 / KR | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jin Young Seoul 07255 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jin Mo Seoul 04188 / KR | 03 /
HONG, In Ki Seoul 06261 / KR | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 20939934.4 | 09.11.2020 | [2023/15] | WO2020KR15598 | Priority number, date | KR20200069288 | 08.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200069288 | [2023/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021251566 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162921 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61K8/25, A61K8/81, A61K8/73, A61K8/46, A61K8/35, A61K8/04, A61Q17/04, A61K8/49 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR);
A61K8/19 (KR);
A61K8/042 (KR);
A61K8/25 (EP,KR);
A61K8/35 (KR);
A61K8/46 (KR);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/4946 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP,KR);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/737 (EP);
A61K8/8141 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/15] | A61K8/19, A61K8/25, A61K8/81, A61K8/73, A61K8/46, A61K8/35, A61K8/04, A61Q17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | WASSERDISPERGIERBARE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR UV-BLOCKIERUNG MIT ANORGANISCHEM VERDICKUNGSMITTEL UND ORGANISCHEM VERDICKUNGSMITTEL | [2023/15] | English: | WATER-DISPERSIBLE COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR ULTRAVIOLET BLOCKING CONTAINING INORGANIC THICKENER AND ORGANIC THICKENER | [2023/15] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE DISPERSIBLE DANS L'EAU POUR LE BLOCAGE DES ULTRAVIOLETS CONTENANT UN ÉPAISSISSANT INORGANIQUE ET UN ÉPAISSISSANT ORGANIQUE | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2022 | Translation filed | 30.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002182155 (SENGUPTA ASHOKE K [US], et al); | [A]KR20170034169 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20180098773 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20190038028 (COSMAX INC [KR]); |