EP3993153 - END COVER ASSEMBLY, HOUSING ASSEMBLY, BATTERY CELL, BATTERY, AND POWERED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xinxiang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Shoujun Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Yulian Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Peng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
LI, Wei Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
LIANG, Chengdu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Sadler, Peter Frederick Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20940478.9 | 07.09.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN113784 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022047788 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993153 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/655, H01M50/147, H01M50/308 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H01M50/15 (EP,US);
H01M50/655 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/103 (EP,US);
H01M50/184 (US);
H01M50/186 (US);
H01M50/209 (US);
H01M50/308 (EP,US);
H01M50/3425 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/392 (KR);
H01M50/618 (KR);
H01M50/627 (EP);
H01M50/636 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ENDABDECKUNGSANORDNUNG, GEHÄUSEANORDNUNG, BATTERIEZELLE, BATTERIE UND ANGETRIEBENE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | END COVER ASSEMBLY, HOUSING ASSEMBLY, BATTERY CELL, BATTERY, AND POWERED DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE COUVERCLE D'EXTRÉMITÉ, ENSEMBLE BOÎTIER, CELLULE DE BATTERIE, BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF MOTORISÉ | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | Translation filed | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013034757 (DOYLE MICHAEL A [US]); | [XYI]CN207896129U (CHENGDU TECLOMAN ENERGY STORAGE TECH CO LTD) |