EP4170265 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Yuki Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
FUJITSUKA, Masashi Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
NAKAI, Takahiro Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 20940660.2 | 19.06.2020 | [2023/17] | WO2020JP24140 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021255921 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170265 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00, F25B1/00, F24F11/84, F25B41/39, F25B49/02 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F24F11/84 (EP);
F25B1/00 (EP);
F25B41/39 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B2400/16 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2700/1931 (EP);
F25B2700/1933 (EP);
F25B2700/21152 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | F25B43/00, F25B1/00, F24F11/84 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2023/17] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | Translation filed | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2068094 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO2019073517 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2019173987 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0025] , [0026] , [0046] - [0049]; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US2020116396 (ITO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2008064436 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0017]-[0057], fig. 1-4 *; | [A]WO2017017767 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]EP3147592 (HONEYWELL SPOL S R O [CZ]) [A] 1-10* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2019173987 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011]-[0012], [0025]-[0026], [0046]-[0049], fig. 1, 6-7 * | by applicant | JP19950001483 |