EP4173397 - UE-ASSISTED SINGLE FREQUENCY NETWORK (SFN) MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Runxin San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ABDELGHAFFAR, Muhammad Sayed Khairy San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yu San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
MUKKAVILLI, Krishna Kiran San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
KWON, Hwan Joon San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 20943244.2 | 28.06.2020 | [2023/18] | WO2020CN98562 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022000133 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173397 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04L5/0035 (EP,US);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04B17/309 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄTEUNTERSTÜTZTE EINZELFREQUENZNETZWERKVERWALTUNG | [2023/18] | English: | UE-ASSISTED SINGLE FREQUENCY NETWORK (SFN) MANAGEMENT | [2023/18] | French: | GESTION DE RÉSEAU À FRÉQUENCE UNIQUE (SFN) ASSISTÉE PAR ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020144639 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [E]WO2021055893 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | International search | [A]CN109962765 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [XA]CN110431799 (QUALCOMM INC); | [A]WO2020046802 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]CN111010890 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); |