EP4184602 - NANO MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND QUANTUM DOT LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TCL Technology Group Corporation TCL Technology Building 17 Huifeng 3rd Road Zhongkai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Xingyuan Guangdong 516000 / CN | 02 /
XU, Wei Guangdong 516000 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jianxin Guangdong 516000 / CN | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 20944956.0 | 30.12.2020 | [2023/21] | WO2020CN141155 | Priority number, date | CN202010692288 | 17.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010692288 | [2023/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022011988 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184602 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/165 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H10K50/115 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/165 (EP,CN);
B01J13/06 (EP,CN);
B82Y10/00 (EP,CN);
B82Y30/00 (EP,CN);
B82Y40/00 (EP,CN);
C01G9/02 (EP,CN);
H10K50/15 (US);
H10K50/166 (CN);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K85/00 (EP,CN);
H10K2102/101 (CN);
H10K2102/331 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/21] | H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | NANOMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE QUANTENPUNKTLEUCHTDIODE | [2023/21] | English: | NANO MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND QUANTUM DOT LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE | [2023/21] | French: | NANOMATÉRIAU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE À POINTS QUANTIQUES | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2022 | Translation filed | 12.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010308272 (PENG XIAOGANG [US], et al); | [X]US2015047417 (PARK HYUNG JU [KR], et al); | [XI]CN110993808 (NAJINGTECH CO LTD) |