EP4183470 - ORGANIC SOLVENT RECOVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOBO MC Corporation Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/32] |
Former [2023/21] | For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5300001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATEYAMA, Samu Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Takemasa Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Toshiaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | 04 /
SUGIURA, Tsutomu Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | 05 /
KOHNO, Daiki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 20945025.3 | 16.07.2020 | [2023/21] | WO2020JP27692 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022014013 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183470 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/06, B01J20/20, B01J20/34 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
B01J20/20 (EP);
B01D53/0423 (EP);
B01D53/0446 (EP);
B01D53/0462 (EP);
B01D53/06 (EP);
B01J20/28011 (EP);
B01J20/28023 (EP);
B01J20/28033 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/34 (EP);
B01D2257/704 (EP);
B01D2259/41 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON ORGANISCHEN LÖSUNGSMITTELN | [2023/21] | English: | ORGANIC SOLVENT RECOVERY SYSTEM | [2023/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE SOLVANT ORGANIQUE | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2023 | Translation filed | 16.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2010142790 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JP2014147865 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]WO2018101255 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH09308814 (TOHO KAKO KENSETSU KK) [A] 1-4 * , claims, examples, fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2013111552 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-4 * , claims, paragraphs [0017], [0018], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2014147863 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-4 * , claims, examples, fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2014147865 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-4* , claims, examples, fig. 1 *; | [A]WO2018101255 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * , claims, paragraphs [0029], [0040], [0041], examples, fig. 1 * | by applicant | WO2013187274 | JP2014147863 | JP2014240052 |