EP4167537 - OFDM MODULATION DEVICE, OFDM DEMODULATION DEVICE, OFDM COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND OFDM COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKEBOSHI, Yoshihiro Tokyo 1008310 / JP | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 20945045.1 | 13.07.2020 | [2023/16] | WO2020JP27269 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022013923 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167537 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4167537 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L27/2628 (EP,US);
H04L27/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OFDM-MODULATIONSVORRICHTUNG, OFDM-DEMODULATIONSVORRICHTUNG, OFDM-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND OFDM-KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/16] | English: | OFDM MODULATION DEVICE, OFDM DEMODULATION DEVICE, OFDM COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND OFDM COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MODULATION OFDM, DISPOSITIF DE DÉMODULATION OFDM, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION OFDM ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION OFDM | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2023 | Translation filed | 05.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008320069 (LIN YI-SHENG [TW], et al) [A] 2,4 * abstract * * figure 5 * * figure 6 *; | [A]US8724716 (HUH HEON [KR]) [A] 2,4 * figure 6 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 14 *; | [A]WO2018060816 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] *; | [I]WO2018093325 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-4 * page 4 *; | [A] - QINGWANG LU ET AL, "A low-power variable-length FFT processor base on Radix-24 algorithm", MICROELECTRONICS&ELECTRONICS, 2009. PRIMEASIA 2009. ASIA PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON POSTGRADUATE RESEARCH IN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090119), ISBN 978-1-4244-4668-1, pages 129 - 132, XP031617956 [A] 2,4 * figure 3 * * page 130, column r - page 131, column l * | International search | [A]JP2008219502 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraph [0037], fig. 2 *; | [A]US2011038324 (PARK SUNGKI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0025], [0051], fig. 1, 2 *; | [A]JP2016541221 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-10* , paragraphs [0204]-[0208], fig. 9, lines 1-12 *; | [XYA]JP2017525300 (ONE MEDIA LLC) [X] 1, 5, 9-10 * , paragraphs [0040]-[0045], [0160], fig. 2 * [Y] 3, 7 [A] 2, 4, 6, 8; | [YA] - KUO, JEN-CHIH et al., "VLSI Design of a Variable- Length FFT/IFFY Processor for OFDM-Based Communication Systems", EURASIP Journal on Applied Signal Processing, vol. 2003, doi:10.1155/S1110865703309060, (20031224), pages 1306 - 1316, URL: https://asp-eurasipjournals.springeropen.com/articles/10.1155/S1110865703309060, XP003013421 [Y] 3, 7 * , sections 2.2, 4.2, fig. 1, 8 * [A] 1-2, 4-6, 8-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/S1110865703309060 | by applicant | JP2016184814 |