EP4190075 - RELEASE OF PRECONFIGURED UPLINK RESOURCE FOR SMALL DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Ruiming San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
HE, Linhai San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
OZTURK, Ozcan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 20947482.4 | 29.07.2020 | [2023/23] | WO2020CN105516 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022021143 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190075 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/115, H04W76/34, // H04W56/00, H04W74/0833 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04W76/34 (EP);
H04W76/38 (EP,US);
H04W72/115 (EP);
H04W74/0816 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W74/0841 (US);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04W56/0045 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | FREIGABE VON VORKONFIGURIERTEN UPLINK-RESSOURCEN FÜR KLEINE DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2023/23] | English: | RELEASE OF PRECONFIGURED UPLINK RESOURCE FOR SMALL DATA TRANSMISSION | [2023/23] | French: | LIBÉRATION DE RESSOURCE DE LIAISON MONTANTE PRÉ-CONFIGURÉE POUR TRANSMISSION DE PETITES DONNÉES | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2020032659 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,8,11,13,15 * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0522] *; | [X]WO2020088512 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,11-13,15 * abstract *; | US2022007392 [ ] (CHANG NINGJUAN [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0122] ** claims 11, 12 *; | [X] - HOGLUND ANDREAS ET AL, "3GPP Release-16 Preconfigured Uplink Resources for LTE-M and NB-IoT", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS MAGAZINE, IEEE, vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MCOMSTD.001.2000003, ISSN 2471-2825, (20200601), pages 50 - 56, (20200710), XP011798916 [X] 1-15 * section "Introduction" - "Conclusion and Discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOMSTD.001.2000003 |