EP4193517 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Xin Beijing / CN | 02 /
WU, Lianhai Chaoyang District Beijing 100028 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Tingfang Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Haiming Beijing 100011 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 20948208.2 | 06.08.2020 | [2023/24] | WO2020CN107507 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022027478 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193517 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H04W36/0044 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR HANDOVER | [2023/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDOVER | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013044731 (SHI GUANGMING [US], et al); | [A]US2018302128 (AKKARAKARAN SONY [US], et al); | [A]US2019141539 (YERRAMALLI SRINIVAS [US], et al) |