EP4156585 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING ANTENNA PANEL FOR TRANSMISSION, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wenhong Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Zhihua Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 20948263.7 | 07.08.2020 | [2023/13] | WO2020CN108005 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022027683 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156585 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/0404, H04B7/06, H04L1/08 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0404 (EP);
H04B7/0691 (EP);
H04L1/1819 (EP);
H04L1/189 (US);
H04L5/0035 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER ANTENNENTAFEL ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/13] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ANTENNA PANEL FOR TRANSMISSION, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE PANNEAU D'ANTENNE POUR LA TRANSMISSION, ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2022 | Translation filed | 23.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 31.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/26] | 20.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN110535614 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1,12,15 * abstract * [I] 2-11,13,14; | [XI]US2020205150 (CHENG YU-HSIN [TW], et al) [X] 1,12,15 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * [I] 2-11,13,14; | [XI]WO2020155179 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-15 * abstract * [I] 6,9; | US2021367730 [ ] (CHEN WENHONG [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0105] * * figure 5 *; | EP4027561 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0182] * |