EP4195854 - RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Wei Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 20948281.9 | 06.08.2020 | [2023/24] | WO2020CN107523 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022027484 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195854 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/0833 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W74/002 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/24] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2022 | Translation filed | 30.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP4185061 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * claims 1-40 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0151] *; | [A] - XIAOMI, "Study on the Support for Multi-modality Interaction", vol. SA WG1, no. E-meeting; 20200518 - 20200522, (20200527), 3GPP DRAFT; S1-202286, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG1_Serv/TSGS1_90e_ElectronicMeeting/Docs/S1-202286.zip S1-202286 New SID_Study on the Support for Multi-modality Interaction.doc, (20200527), XP051891966 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ASUSTEK, "Discussion on multiple random access parameters in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1707086 DISCUSSION ON MULTIPLE RANDOM ACCESS CONFIGURATIONS IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOL, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170626), XP051301579 [A] 1-15 |