EP4213220 - TRANSPARENT ELECTRODE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TRANSPARENT ELECTRODE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Energy Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2023/35] |
Former [2023/29] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIDA Naomi Minato-ku, Tokyo 1050023 / JP | 02 /
NAITO Katsuyuki Minato-ku, Tokyo 1050023 / JP | 03 /
SAITA Yutaka Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2120013 / JP | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 20950478.6 | 09.09.2020 | [2023/29] | WO2020JP34040 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022054150 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213220 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H10K30/82, H01L31/0224, H10K71/00, H10K50/816, H01B5/14, H05B33/28 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H10K50/816 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/022466 (CN);
H10K30/82 (EP,US);
H01B5/14 (EP);
H01L31/0224 (EP);
H01L31/1884 (CN);
H01L31/1888 (CN);
H05B33/28 (EP);
H10K71/621 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/29] | H01L31/0224, H01B5/14, H05B33/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE ELEKTRODE, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER TRANSPARENTEN ELEKTRODE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/29] | English: | TRANSPARENT ELECTRODE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TRANSPARENT ELECTRODE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/29] | French: | ÉLECTRODE TRANSPARENTE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLECTRODE TRANSPARENTE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | Translation filed | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2015115180 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [Y]JP2017135379 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]KR20180035057 (KOLON INC [KR]); | [Y]US2019027622 (SHIDA NAOMI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2020054018 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [Y]CN111192708 (DONGJIN SEMICHEM CO LTD); | International search | [Y]US2015130726 (MIN BYUNG CHAN [KR], et al); | [A]CN105038222 (UNIV HENAN SCIENCE & TECH); | [YA]JP2017135379 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [YA]KR20180020624 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20180098019 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2019021599 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JP2014532025 |