EP4223636 - VERTICAL-TAKE-OFF AERIAL VEHICLE WITH AEROFOIL-SHAPED INTEGRATED FUSELAGE AND WINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Filho, Alberto Carlos Pereira Atibaia, 221 - Jd. Apolo 12243-210 São José dos Campos / BR | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Benetazzo, Flavia Via Cola, 2 F 60027 Osimo (AN) / IT | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 20955476.5 | 29.09.2020 | [2023/32] | WO2020BR50388 | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022067401 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | PT | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223636 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64C29/00, B64C15/12, B64C15/00, B64C1/00, B64C3/00, B64C3/10, B64C11/00, B64D27/00, B64D35/00 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
B64C29/0033 (EP,US);
B64C29/00 (GB);
B64C15/12 (EP,GB,US);
B64C1/00 (EP,GB,US);
B64C1/0009 (EP);
B64C11/00 (GB);
B64C15/00 (GB);
B64C3/00 (GB);
B64C3/10 (GB);
B64C39/08 (US);
B64D27/00 (GB);
B64D27/24 (EP);
B64D27/34 (US);
B64D35/00 (EP,GB);
B64D35/021 (US);
B64U10/20 (EP,GB,US);
B64U20/70 (EP);
B64U30/10 (EP);
B64U30/26 (EP);
B64U50/18 (EP,GB,US);
B64U50/23 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | SENKRECHTSTARTENDES LUFTFAHRZEUG MIT TRAGFLÄCHENFÖRMIGEM INTEGRIERTEM RUMPF UND FLÜGELN | [2023/32] | English: | VERTICAL-TAKE-OFF AERIAL VEHICLE WITH AEROFOIL-SHAPED INTEGRATED FUSELAGE AND WINGS | [2023/32] | French: | VÉHICULE AÉRIEN À DÉCOLLAGE VERTICAL POURVU D'UN FUSELAGE ET D'AILES INTÉGRÉES DANS LE PROFIL AÉRODYNAMIQUE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2023 | Translation filed | 05.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8720814 (SMITH FRICK A [US]); | [X]CN204895858U (ZHANG QINGWEI); | [A]CN204998771U (CAO YI); | [Y]CN106741919 (SF TECH CO LTD); | [XY]US2019135424 (BAITY SEAN MARSHALL [US], et al); | [XY]US10640207 (LEE MYEONG KYU [KR], et al); | [A]WO2020105045 (ISRAEL AEROSPACE IND LTD [IL]); | [A]US10773802 (FINLAY TAMARA JEAN [CA], et al); | [A]EP3708492 (SHANGHAI AUTOFLIGHT CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [XYA]US8720814 (SMITH FRICK A [US]); | [XY]CN204895858U (ZHANG QINGWEI); | [A]CN204998771U (CAO YI); | [Y]CN106741919 (SF TECH CO LTD); | [XY]US2019135424 (BAITY SEAN MARSHALL [US], et al); | [XY]US10640207 (LEE MYEONG KYU [KR], et al); | [A]US10773802 (FINLAY TAMARA JEAN [CA], et al) | by applicant | US7159817 |