EP4030192 - RADAR AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, Mark Birmingham B9 7SL / GB | 02 /
GARCIA, Flavio Birmingham B29 4DR / GB | 03 /
ZHONG, Steven Yin 13589 Singapore / TH | 04 /
WEI, Zhuo 13589 Singapore / TH | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20956451.7 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020CN128640 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022099604 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030192 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/40, G01S13/931, G06F21/44, G01S7/00, G01S13/02, G01S13/52, G06N20/00, // G01S7/497, G01S7/52, G01S17/931, G01S15/931, G01S7/41, G01S17/58, G01S15/52 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/44 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,CN);
G01S13/505 (US);
G01S13/52 (EP);
G01S13/862 (CN);
G01S13/865 (CN);
G01S13/867 (CN);
G01S15/52 (EP);
G01S15/931 (EP);
G01S17/58 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/003 (EP);
G01S7/40 (EP);
G01S7/497 (EP);
G01S7/52004 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G01S2013/0236 (US);
G01S2013/9323 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | G01S13/02, G06F21/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | RADARAUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/29] | English: | RADAR AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE RADAR, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2022 | Translation filed | 13.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007279252 (HELLWIG HANS-PETER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0043] - [0053]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]DE102008000571 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [ 0012] , [ 0022] - [0035]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]DE102012024880 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0010] - [0019] - [ 0032] , [ 0034]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]EP3136123 (AUDI AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [00 6] , [0 10] - [0016] - [ 0019] , [ 0022] , [ 0024] , [0 29] - [0038]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2019383900 (BIALER ODED [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0032] - [0036]; figures 1-3 * |