EP4176997 - MACHINE TOOL, WORKPIECE SUPPORTING TOOL FOR MACHINE TOOL, METHOD FOR OPERATING MACHINE TOOL, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamazaki Mazak Corporation 1-131 Takeda Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Atsushi Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | 02 /
OUCHI, Seigo Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | 03 /
ISHIBASHI, Kazuhiro Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 20956757.7 | 09.10.2020 | [2023/19] | WO2020JP38244 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022074810 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176997 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/04, B23K9/095, B23K9/10, B23K37/02, B23K37/04, B23K9/32 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B23K9/04 (EP,US);
B23K37/0235 (EP,US);
B23K37/04 (EP);
B23K37/0461 (US);
B23K9/0953 (US);
B23K9/0956 (EP,US);
B23K9/1006 (EP);
B23K9/1062 (US);
B23K9/32 (EP);
B23K9/325 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | B23K9/04, B23K15/00, B23K26/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINE, WERKSTÜCKSTÜTZWERKZEUG FÜR WERKZEUGMASCHINE, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE UND PROGRAMM | [2023/19] | English: | MACHINE TOOL, WORKPIECE SUPPORTING TOOL FOR MACHINE TOOL, METHOD FOR OPERATING MACHINE TOOL, AND PROGRAM | [2023/19] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL, OUTIL DE SUPPORT D'UNE PIÈCE POUR MACHINE-OUTIL, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL, ET PROGRAMME | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | Translation filed | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 04.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01257593 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US2017144242 (MCQUEEN JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2018029186 (RÖDERS JÜRGEN [DE], et al); | [A]JP2018103307 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) | International search | [A]JPH06285655 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0031], fig. 3-7 *; | [A]JPH07284935 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-15* , paragraphs [0018]-[0020], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP6100449B (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP.) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0019], fig. 1-3 *; | [A]JP2019150857 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0023], fig. 4, 5 *; | [A]WO2020079870 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0107]-[0120], fig. 25, 26 *; | [A]JP2020069521 (IHI CORP) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0027], fig. 1, 2 * |