EP4108023 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING UE POWER CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Huiying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
AI, Jianxun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 20957037.3 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/52] | WO2020CN120836 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022077256 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108023 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W68/005 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES STROMVERBRAUCHS EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS | [2022/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING UE POWER CONSUMPTION | [2022/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE UE | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - ZTE, "Potential UE complexity reduction features", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200817 - 20200828, (20200808), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2005474, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_102-e/Docs/R1-2005474.zip R1-2005474 On UE complexity reduction_v2.doc, (20200808), XP051917496 [X] 1,3,7-9,11,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-6,10,12,13 |