EP4211918 - RESOURCE CONFIGURATION USING THE BURST SPREAD PARAMETER FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Jie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
SHA, Xiubin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
DAI, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LU, Ting Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 20957133.0 | 15.10.2020 | [2023/29] | WO2020CN121205 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022077354 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4211918 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/00, H04W56/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04W56/0045 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/26025 (KR);
H04W56/0065 (KR);
H04W72/11 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENKONFIGURATION UNTER VERWENDUNG DES BURST-SPREIZPARAMETERS FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2023/29] | English: | RESOURCE CONFIGURATION USING THE BURST SPREAD PARAMETER FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2023/29] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE RESSOURCES UTILISANT LE PARAMÈTRE D'ÉTALEMENT DE RAFALE POUR DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013023354 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al); |