EP4214947 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ENHANCING INTEGRATED ACCESS BACKHAUL NETWORKS FOR NEW RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Hao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Lin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Ying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Liping Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
DIAO, Xueying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 20958148.7 | 22.10.2020 | [2023/30] | WO2020CN122700 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022082565 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214947 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W36/08, H04W24/04, // H04W84/04 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04W24/04 (EP);
H04W36/305 (KR);
H04W36/087 (US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W36/0055 (KR);
H04W36/00837 (KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,KR);
H04W36/38 (KR);
H04W72/231 (KR);
H04W76/18 (KR);
H04W76/19 (KR);
H04W84/047 (KR);
H04W84/042 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON INTEGRIERTEN ZUGANGS-BACKHAUL-NETZWERKEN FÜR NEW RADIO | [2023/30] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ENHANCING INTEGRATED ACCESS BACKHAUL NETWORKS FOR NEW RADIO | [2023/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'AMÉLIORATION DE RÉSEAUX D'ACCÈS ET DE RACCORDEMENT INTÉGRÉS POUR NOUVELLE RADIO | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2016249259 (PARK KYUNGMIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0516]; figure 12 * [A] 4,9,14; | [YA]WO2019246446 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0163]; figures 7-9 * [A] 4,9,14; | [A]WO2020076228 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [YA]WO2020166912 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0308]; figure 16a * [A] 4,9,14 |