EP4174963 - LIGHT EMITTING DIODE SUBSTRATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Haixu Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiao Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Fei Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Mingxing Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
LI, Shulei Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
DONG, Xue Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
YUAN, Guangcai Beijing 100176 / CN | 08 /
CAO, Zhanfeng Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
GU, Xin Beijing 100176 / CN | 10 /
WANG, Ke Beijing 100176 / CN | 11 /
QU, Feng Beijing 100176 / CN | 12 /
LIANG, Xuan Beijing 100176 / CN | 13 /
YAN, Junwei Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 20959255.9 | 30.10.2020 | [2023/18] | WO2020CN125490 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022088093 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174963 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/00, H01L21/683, // H01L25/16, H01L33/62 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L33/0095 (EP);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68322 (EP);
H01L2221/68354 (US);
H01L2221/68363 (EP);
H01L2221/68368 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68386 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | H01L33/00, H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | LEUCHTDIODENSUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/18] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DIODE SUBSTRATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2023/18] | French: | SUBSTRAT À DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2023 | Translation filed | 26.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010259164 (OOHATA TOYOHARU [JP], et al); | [XAY]US2019044023 (CHENG KAI [TW], et al); | [XY]US2019393069 (PARANJPE AJIT P [US], et al) |