EP4228356 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUAN, Yidi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Xinqian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Zhiheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 20959266.6 | 30.10.2020 | [2023/33] | WO2020CN125546 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022088105 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228356 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/33] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2023 | Translation filed | 10.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017346616 (LIU KUNPENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0217] - [0235]; figures 3a-3d *; | [XI]US2020068610 (LI HUA [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [ 111] , [ 112] , [ 115] , [ 119] , [ 135] , [ 139]; figures 5, 6, 7 * [I] 2,5,6,8,11,12; | [A]WO2020171478 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 82] , [0 88]; figure 11 *; | US2022061094 [ ] (JUNG HOI YOON [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0006] , [0 82] , [0 88]; figure 11 * |