EP4245735 - OPTICAL GLASS, OPTICAL ELEMENT, OPTICAL SYSTEM, DOUBLET LENS, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS FOR CAMERA, OBJECTIVE LENS FOR MICROSCOPE, AND OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIDE, Tetsuya Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 20961571.5 | 12.11.2020 | [2023/38] | WO2020JP42233 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022102043 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245735 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/21, C03C3/062 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
C03C3/21 (EP,US);
C03C3/062 (EP,US);
G02B21/02 (US);
G02B3/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | C03C3/21, C03C3/068, C03C3/17, C03C3/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES GLAS, OPTISCHES ELEMENT, OPTISCHES SYSTEM, DUBLETTLINSE, WECHSELOBJEKTIV FÜR EINE KAMERA, OBJEKTIVLINSE FÜR MIKROSKOP UND OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/38] | English: | OPTICAL GLASS, OPTICAL ELEMENT, OPTICAL SYSTEM, DOUBLET LENS, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS FOR CAMERA, OBJECTIVE LENS FOR MICROSCOPE, AND OPTICAL DEVICE | [2023/38] | French: | VERRE OPTIQUE, ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE, SYSTÈME OPTIQUE, LENTILLE DOUBLET, LENTILLE INTERCHANGEABLE POUR CAMÉRA, OBJECTIF POUR MICROSCOPE ET DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2023 | Translation filed | 10.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2003238197 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2014185075 (HOYA CORP); | [A]US2020255326 (KOIDE TETSUYA [JP]); | [E]EP4245736 (NIKON CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2003300751 (OHARA KK); | [A]JP2010006675 (OHARA KK); | [A]JP2010222236 (OHARA KK); | [XYA]JP2014185075 (HOYA CORP); | [A]JP2017001948 (OHARA KK); | [YA]JP2019001675 (HIKARI GLASS CO LTD) |