EP4252478 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SMALL DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUE, Ran Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Haiming Beijing 100011 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Jie Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
WU, Lianhai Beijing 100028 / CN | 05 /
XU, Min Beijing 100094 / CN | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 20962768.6 | 25.11.2020 | [2023/40] | WO2020CN131504 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022109877 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4252478 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04W74/0875 (EP,US);
H04W74/0808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG KLEINER DATENMENGEN | [2023/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SMALL DATA TRANSMISSION | [2023/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE PETITES DONNÉES | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3434061 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |