EP4261474 - RELAY DEVICE AND AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Chitose Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 20965072.0 | 09.12.2020 | [2023/42] | WO2020JP45861 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022123689 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261474 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B5/02, F25B41/00, F25B41/24, F25B49/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
F25B41/00 (EP);
F24F1/0063 (US);
F24F13/30 (US);
F25B41/24 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B5/02 (EP);
F24F2140/20 (US);
F25B2313/0233 (EP);
F25B2339/047 (EP);
F25B2400/01 (EP);
F25B2400/06 (EP);
F25B2600/2519 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | F25B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | RELAISVORRICHTUNG UND KLIMAANLAGE | [2023/42] | English: | RELAY DEVICE AND AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE | [2023/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RELAIS ET DISPOSITIF DE CLIMATISATION | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | Translation filed | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002005537 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0084]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP2508819 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0070]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP2835602 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * & associated description;; figures 8,10 * | International search | [A]WO2013144996 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]WO2014103013 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2018185140 (AZBIL CORP)[A] 1-7; | [A]WO2019163042 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP6678837B [A] 1-7 | by applicant | JPH0378837B |