EP4267305 - MECHANICAL HEATING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HP Health Solutions Inc. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEHLER, Duane A. Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 02 /
KNOWLES, Devin Michael Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 03 /
KOEPL, Devin Nichlos Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 20967185.8 | 22.12.2020 | [2023/44] | WO2020US66627 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022139815 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4267305 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01L7/00, G01N33/48, G01N35/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (US);
B01L2200/147 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00346 (EP,US);
G01N35/0098 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/44] | B01L7/00, G01N33/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE HEIZUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2023/44] | English: | MECHANICAL HEATING CONTROL | [2023/44] | French: | COMMANDE DE CHAUFFAGE MÉCANIQUE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5281516 (STAPLETON MARILYN J [US], et al) [X] 6,7,11 * column 6, line 25 - line 64; figure 1 * * column 8, line 46 - line 47 * * column 9, line 16 - line 34; figure 7 * * column 10, line 20 *[I] 12-15; | [XI]US2006046304 (SHIGEURA JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 6,8,11 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075]; figure 3 * [I] 12-15; | [XYI]US2008176290 (JOSEPH VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-12 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0177]; figures 6, 7 * * paragraph [0204] * [Y] 4,15 [I] 13,14; | [A]US7799521 (CHEN SHUQI [US]) [A] 1-5,9-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2018135102 (GUBATAYAO THOMAS CATALINO [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0130] *; | [Y]WO2018119227 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0074] * | International search | [Y]US2004209331 (RIRIE KIRK [US]) [Y] 7* , [0052] *; | [XY]US7799521 (CHEN SHUQI [US]) [X] 1, 3, 5-6, 9-12 * , col.2, lines 30-32, col. 8, lines 60- col. 9, line 11, col. 11, lines 56-62, col. 15, lines 9-12, col. 16, lines 20-26, col. 17, lines 56-58, col. 20, lines 30, 41-51, col. 40, lines 45-51, 65-67 * [Y] 2, 4, 7-8, 13-15; | [Y]US2018135102 (GUBATAYAO THOMAS CATALINO [US], et al) [Y] 2, 8, 13-14 * , [0079], [0085], [0106], [0107] *; | [Y]WO2018119227 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 4, 15 * , [0019], [0042], [0048], [0049], [0053] * |