EP4272202 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE SUBSAMPLING FOR DEMURA CORRECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Natan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
STAN, Daniel San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
IKIZYAN, Ike San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
STERNBERG, Mark San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
TANG, Timothy David San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
LI, Yan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
YANG, Xinchao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20967372.2 | 29.12.2020 | [2023/45] | WO2020CN140650 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022141022 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272202 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/00, G09G3/3208 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
G09G3/3208 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/006 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2074 (KR,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,KR);
G09G2330/021 (EP);
G09G2340/0457 (EP);
G09G2350/00 (EP);
G09G2360/145 (EP);
G09G2360/16 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | G09G3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ADAPTIVEN UNTERABTASTUNG FÜR DEMURA-KORREKTUREN | [2023/45] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE SUBSAMPLING FOR DEMURA CORRECTIONS | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE SOUS-ÉCHANTILLONNAGE ADAPTATIF POUR CORRECTIONS D'EFFET MURA | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017309213 (ROH SEOK HWAN [KR], et al); | [XYI]US2018158173 (GAO SHENGKUI [US], et al); | [X]US2019340965 (CHANG CHIA-WEI [TW], et al); | [Y]WO2020004704 (SAPIEN SEMICONDUCTORS INC [KR]); | US2021233491 [ ] (LEE JAE HOON [KR]) |