EP4124844 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING MATERIAL CHARACTERISTICS FOR EDIBLE MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitatea Stefan cel Mare Suceava - Romania Str. Universitatii Nr.13 720229 Suceava / RO | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutt, Gheorghe Sat Sf. Ilie - Scheia / RO | 02 /
Amariei, Sonia Sat Sf. Ilie - Scheia / RO | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 21000204.4 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124844 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/04, G01N3/06, G01N3/12, G01N33/02, G01N3/20, G01M5/00 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
G01N3/04 (EP);
G01N3/068 (EP);
G01N3/20 (EP);
G01N33/02 (EP);
G01N2203/0023 (EP);
G01N2203/0044 (EP);
G01N2203/0067 (EP);
G01N2203/0075 (EP);
G01N2203/0218 (EP);
G01N2203/0252 (EP);
G01N2203/0282 (EP);
G01N2203/0411 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON MATERIAL KENNWERTEN FÜR ESSBARE MEMBRANEN | [2023/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING MATERIAL CHARACTERISTICS FOR EDIBLE MEMBRANES | [2023/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DES MATÉRIAUX POUR MEMBRANES COMESTIBLES | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/05] | 02.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/02] | 28.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 08.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 08.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6050138 (LYNCH KEVIN R [US], et al) [X] 1-6* abstract *; | [X]EP1443317 (UNITED BISCUITS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0 83] , [0 84] , [0 98] *; | [X]CN205898575U (UNIV JINAN) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 6] , [00 8] , [0 13] , [0015]; figure 1; claim 6 * |