EP4148074 - TWO PACK AMBIENT CURE CROSSLINKABLE PAINT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING COPOLYMERS OF VINYL BRANCHED ESTERS AND VINYL SILANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexion Inc. 180 East Broad Street Columbus, OH 43215 / US | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinbrecher, Christophe 1348 Ottignies Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | 02 /
Boulet, Laure 1348 Ottignies Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | 03 /
Heymans, Denis 1348 Ottignies Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21075010.5 | 08.09.2021 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148074 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08F218/08, C08F218/10, C09D131/02, C09D131/04 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
C08F218/08 (EP);
C08F218/10 (EP);
C09D131/02 (EP);
C09D131/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F218/08, C08F218/10, C08F218/10, C08F230/085, C08F230/085 (EP);
C08F218/10, C08F218/10, C08F230/085, C08F230/085 (EP);
C09D131/02, C08K5/29 (EP);
C09D131/02, C08K5/57 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEI UMGEBUNGSTEMPERATUR HÄRTBARE VERNETZBARE ZWEIPACK-BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ETHALTEND COPOLYMERE VON VERZWEIGTEN VINYLESTERN UND VINYLSILANEN | [2023/11] | English: | TWO PACK AMBIENT CURE CROSSLINKABLE PAINT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING COPOLYMERS OF VINYL BRANCHED ESTERS AND VINYL SILANES | [2023/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT À DEUX COMPOSANTS RÉTICULABLES DURCISSANT À TEMPÉRATURE AMBIANTE ET COMPRENENT DES ESTERS VINYLIQUES RAMIFIÉS ET DES SILANES VINILIQUES | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5886125 (HUYBRECHTS JOSEF [BE]) [Y] 5,6 * examples 1-4 * * column 4, line 20 - line 30 *; | [A]EP1205503 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-10* example 1 *; | [XY]EP3363827 (HEXION RES BELGIUM SA [BE]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * examples 2,3; table 1 * * paragraph [0022] * [Y] 5,6 | by applicant | US4043953 | EP0007765 | EP0050249 | WO2004067576 |