EP3846374 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND SELECTION OF DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION (DCI) CANDIDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 1445 South Spectrum Blvd, Suite 102 Chandler, AZ 85286 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | ||
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states VIAVI SOLUTION INC 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Wei 21 Broomwalk Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 1UT / GB | 02 /
HUANG, Li-Ke 30 Cottonmill Crescent St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 1HW / GB | 03 /
SUN, Kexuan 140 Priestley Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG2 0BP / GB | 04 /
LUO, Hua 31 Norfolk Road Luton, Bedfordshire LU2 0RE / GB | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21150120.0 | 04.01.2021 | [2021/27] | Priority number, date | US202016735200 | 06.01.2020 Original published format: US202016735200 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846374 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3846374 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/0058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] |
Former [2021/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND AUSWAHL VON DOWNLINK-STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONS(DCI)-KANDIDATEN | [2021/27] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND SELECTION OF DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION (DCI) CANDIDATES | [2021/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE SÉLECTION DE CANDIDATS D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE (DCI) | [2021/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 05.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | MC | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | LU | 04.01.2024 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
IT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
MC | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SK | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
IT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SK | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2019019938 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,7-10,13,15 * abstract * [Y] 5,12 [I] 3,4,6,11,14; | [P]EP3661261 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]) [P] * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * tables paragraph 44, 46 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] *; | [Y] - NOKIA ET AL, "On two-stage DCI for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1703314_ON TWO-STAGE DCI FOR NR_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051210444 [Y] 5,12 * page 3, line 8 - line 10 * * page 3, line 22 - line 37 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Clarification on DCI formats monitoring", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1910899 CLARIFICATION ON DCI FORMATS MONITORING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1910899.zip R1-1910899 Clarification on DCI formats monitoring.docx, (20191005), XP051808735 [A] 1-15 * page 3 - page 4 * | [A] - MEDIATEK INC, "DCI Contents in NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707824 DCI CONTENTS IN NR_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273025 [A] 1-15 * page 3; figures 2,3 * |