EP3848739 - REDUCED RADIUS OPTICAL FIBER WITH HIGH MECHANICAL RELIABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abedijaberi, Arash Corning Incorporated One Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY New York 14831 / US | 02 /
Bickham, Scott Robertson Corning Incorporated One Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY New York 14831 / US | 03 /
Stainer, Darren Andrew Corning Incorporated One Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY New York 14831 / US | 04 /
Tandon, Pushkar Corning Incorporated One Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY New York 14831 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 21150130.9 | 04.01.2021 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US202062957879P | 07.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062957879 P | NL20202024737 | 23.01.2020 Original published format: NL 2024737 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848739 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3848739 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, G02B6/02, G02B6/028, G02B6/036 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G02B6/443 (EP,US);
G02B6/02395 (EP,US);
G02B6/02009 (EP,US);
G02B6/0288 (EP);
G02B6/03627 (US);
G02B6/03694 (EP);
G02B6/4427 (EP);
G02B6/4478 (EP);
G02B6/4486 (US);
C03C25/1065 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASER MIT REDUZIERTEM RADIUS MIT HOHER MECHANISCHER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT | [2021/28] | English: | REDUCED RADIUS OPTICAL FIBER WITH HIGH MECHANICAL RELIABILITY | [2021/28] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE À RAYON RÉDUIT ET À HAUTE FIABILITÉ MÉCANIQUE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007077016 (BICKHAM SCOTT R [US], et al); | [Y]US2019331849 (BENNETT KEVIN WALLACE [US], et al); | [Y]US2019331850 (BENNETT KEVIN WALLACE [US], et al) | by applicant | US6316516 | US6563996 |