EP3848755 - PROJECTION SYSTEM COMPRISING A GLASS PANEL FOR TRANSPARENT SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONDU, Thomas 27 rue des Vergers 45110 Saint-Martin d'Abbat / FR | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 21150159.8 | 05.01.2021 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | FR20200000243 | 10.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000243 | [2021/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848755 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/604, G03B21/62, // G02B27/01 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G03B21/604 (EP);
G03B21/62 (EP);
G02B2027/0118 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSSYSTEM, DAS EINE VERGLASUNG FÜR EINEN TRANSPARENTEN SCHIRM UMFASST | [2021/28] | English: | PROJECTION SYSTEM COMPRISING A GLASS PANEL FOR TRANSPARENT SCREEN | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROJECTION COMPRENANT UN VITRAGE POUR ECRAN TRANSPARENT | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 13.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6449089 (MOSHREFZADEH ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 10, lines 48-67; figures 3a, 4a, 5 * * column 7, lines 44-59 * * column 6, lines 37-55 * [Y] 3,5,7,8 [I] 9; | [Y]EP0766126 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 8, lines 6-9 *; | [Y]US2017052440 (ROSSINI UMBERTO [FR]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045]; figures 3a-3c *; | [Y]WO2013190958 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | US6449089 |