EP3852256 - A SELF-CALIBRATION METHOD FOR SELF-POWERED SINGLE CT CURRENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Shou Qi Zhao Chong Gong Lu 2588, Chong Gu, 6, No. 202 Shanghai, 201706 / CN | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/29] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21151592.9 | 14.01.2021 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | CN20201037938 | 14.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010037938 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852256 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3852256 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, G01R15/18, H01F38/32 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
H02M1/0009 (EP);
G01R19/0092 (CN);
G01R19/22 (US);
G01R15/18 (EP,CN);
G01R35/005 (EP,US);
H01F38/32 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTKALIBRIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SELBSTVERSORGENDEN EINZELSTROMWANDLER-STROMSENSOR | [2023/27] | English: | A SELF-CALIBRATION METHOD FOR SELF-POWERED SINGLE CT CURRENT SENSOR | [2021/29] | French: | CAPTEUR DE COURANT AUTO-ALIMENTÉ BASÉ SUR UN SEUL TRANSFORMATEUR DE COURANT | [2021/29] |
Former [2021/29] | SELBSTKALIBRIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SELBSTVERSORGTEN EINZELSTROMWANDLER-STROMSENSOR | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5532918 (MAYRAND JAMES F [US], et al); | [Y]US2011196629 (COUTELOU OLIVIER [FR], et al); | [Y]US2013181723 (MAUDER ANTON [DE], et al); | [YA]EP2960659 (EFORE OYJ [FI]); | [YA]EP3023806 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC [US]); | [YA]CN106093674 (UNIV XIAN SCI & TECHNOLOGY ); | [Y]US2017030952 (SHAMIR ADI [IL], et al) |