EP3851629 - ROLLING SHUTTER WITH STACKABLE TELESCOPIC LATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIKAU s.r.l. Via Appia Km 632.200 74016 Massafra (TA) / IT | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTANARO, Donato c/o KIKAU S.R.L. Via Appia Km 632.200 74016 Massafra (TA) / IT | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | IP Sextant s.r.l. Via A. Salandra, n.18 00187 Rome / IT | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 21151903.8 | 15.01.2021 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | IT20200001018 | 20.01.2020 Original published format: IT202000001018 | [2021/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851629 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851629 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/165, E06B9/15 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
E06B9/165 (EP);
E06B2009/1566 (EP);
E06B2009/1577 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROLLADEN AUS TELESKOPIERBAREN STAPELBAREN ROLLADENSTÄBEN | [2021/29] | English: | ROLLING SHUTTER WITH STACKABLE TELESCOPIC LATHS | [2021/29] | French: | VOLET ROULANT AVEC LAMELLES TÉLESCOPIQUES EMPILABLES | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 20.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2243606 (SIAMESI SRL [IT]); | [A]EP0367212 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP1096098 (KRALER FRANZ [AT]); | [XAI]US2007012409 (TWINA YEHEZKEL [IL]) | by applicant | EP0367212 | EP1096098 | EP3184726 |