EP3869130 - REFRIGERATION DEVICE WITH FINNED EVAPORATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liengaard, Niels Aspachweg 18 89079 Ulm / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21152458.2 | 20.01.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | DE202010202172 | 20.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020202172 | [2021/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869130 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
F25D17/067 (EP);
F25D17/06 (CN);
F25B39/02 (CN);
F25D19/00 (CN);
F25D2317/0683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEGERÄT MIT LAMELLENVERDAMPFER | [2021/34] | English: | REFRIGERATION DEVICE WITH FINNED EVAPORATOR | [2021/34] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR POURVU D'ÉVAPORATEUR À LAMELLES | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2997857 (CLARK HARRY F) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 3,7-9; | [Y]JPH03169482 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [Y] 10-15* figure 3 *; | [XI]WO2006120079 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * [I] 3,7-9; | [XI]DE102006015992 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [I] 3,7-9; | [XYI]DE102010038373 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * figure 4 * [Y] 10-15 [I] 3,6-9 | by applicant | KR19980018857U |