EP3859393 - LIGHT SOURCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, ES, SK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices International Unlimited Company Bay F1 Raheen Industrial Estate Limerick / IE | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HURWITZ, Jonathan 10 Claremont Park Edinburgh, Lothian EH6 7PJ / GB | 02 /
NEIL, David 65 Haymarket Terrace Edinburgh, Lothian EH12 5HD / GB | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Horler, Philip John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/31] | Horler, Philip John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 21152620.7 | 20.01.2021 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | US202016780735 | 03.02.2020 Original published format: US202016780735 | US202016780761 | 03.02.2020 Original published format: US202016780761 | US202017080629 | 26.10.2020 Original published format: US202017080629 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859393 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3859393 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/042, G01S17/10, G01S7/484, H01S5/0239, H01S5/062, H01S5/183, H05B45/12, H05B47/105 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H05B47/105 (EP);
H05B45/30 (CN);
H01S5/0428 (EP,US);
G01S7/481 (CN);
H01S5/02325 (US);
H01S5/02345 (EP,US);
H01S5/02355 (US);
H01S5/0239 (EP);
H03K17/6871 (US);
H05B45/12 (EP);
G01S7/484 (EP);
H01S5/06216 (EP);
H01S5/183 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | G01S17/10, H01S5/042, H05B45/00, H05B47/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENSYSTEM | [2021/31] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE SYSTEM | [2021/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 31.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2017070029 (MOENECLAEY NICOLAS [FR], et al) [I] 14,15 * page 1, paragraphs 2, 5-15 * * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 4, paragraph 55 * * especially pars. [0027], [0030]; Figs. 1, 2 * [A] 1-13; | [IA]US2018145482 (LEE DENISE [GB], et al) [I] 14,15 * page 1, paragraphs 1, 5-7; figures 1-6 * * page 1, paragraph 17 - page 7, paragraph 65 * [A] 1-13; | [I]US2018180978 (YAMADA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-22 * * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 3, paragraph 31 * * page 4, paragraph 56 - page 18, paragraph 257 * * especially pars. [0240]-[0247] and Figs. 21 *; | [IA]DE102018120251 (ELMOS SEMICONDUCTOR AG [DE]) [I] 14,15 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-39 * * page 4, paragraph 25 - page 19, paragraph 102 * * page 23, paragraph 103 - page 48, paragraph 269 *[A] 1-13; | [XI]US2019267911 (LAWSON THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1,2,10-12,14 * page 1, paragraphs 2, 5-8; figures 1-12 * * page 2, paragraph 30 - page 10, paragraph 118 * * especially Figs. 6A-6C, 7, 8 * [I] 3-9,13,15; | [A]WO2019167039 (B G NEGEV TECHNOLOGIES AND APPLICATIONS LTD AT BEN GURION UNIV [IL]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-12 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 6 * * page 6, paragraph last - page 17, paragraph first * |