EP3919646 - PREPARATION METHOD OF A HIGH-CARBON BEARING STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/49] | HIGH-CARBON BEARING STEEL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Iron & Steel Research Institute No. 76 Xueyuan South Road Haidian District Beijing 100081 / CN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Wenquan Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 02 /
WENG, Yuqing Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 03 /
XU, Haifeng Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Cunyu Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 05 /
YU, Feng Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Hui Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 07 /
SHI, Zhiyue Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | 08 /
XU, Da Beijing, Beijing 100081 / CN | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21152891.4 | 22.01.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | CN202010489419 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010489419 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919646 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C21D1/18, C21D1/32, C21D1/58, C21D6/02, C21D6/00, C21D8/00, F16C33/62, F16C33/64, // F16C33/12, F16C33/14 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,US);
C21D6/008 (US);
C21D1/18 (EP,CN,US);
C21D1/32 (EP,CN,US);
C21D1/58 (EP);
C21D6/00 (EP);
C21D6/002 (EP);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/02 (EP);
C21D8/00 (EP);
C21D8/005 (EP);
C22C33/04 (US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/22 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,CN,US);
F16C33/62 (EP);
F16C33/64 (EP);
C21D2211/001 (CN);
C21D2211/004 (CN);
F16C2204/66 (EP);
F16C2204/70 (EP);
F16C2220/44 (EP);
F16C2220/46 (EP);
F16C2223/10 (EP);
F16C33/121 (EP);
F16C33/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C21D1/18, C21D1/32, C21D1/58, C21D6/02, C21D6/00, C21D8/00, F16C33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KOHLENSTOFFREICHEN LAGERSTAHLS | [2024/41] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD OF A HIGH-CARBON BEARING STEEL | [2024/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ACIER À ROULEMENTS À TENEUR ÉLEVÉE EN CARBONE | [2024/41] |
Former [2021/49] | KOHLENSTOFFREICHER LAGERSTAHL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2021/49] | HIGH-CARBON BEARING STEEL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2021/49] | ACIER À ROULEMENTS À TENEUR ÉLEVÉE EN CARBONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 30.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6263650 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD); | [XI]JP2002275584 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [XI]JP2007113034 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [XI]US7393420 (DAITO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [XA]JP2012132094 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [XAI]JP2013001931 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [XI]JP2014040626 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]US2016145724 (CHA SUNG-CHUL [KR], et al) |