EP3879119 - SURGING PRECURSOR DETECTING DEVICE, METHOD OF DETECTING SURGING PRECURSOR, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008332 / JP | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAKIRI, Kenichiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008332 / JP | 02 /
IBARAKI, Seiichi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008332 / JP | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21153033.2 | 22.01.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | JP20200043944 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020043944 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879119 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/00, F04D27/02 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
F04D27/001 (EP,CN,US);
F04D27/0207 (US);
F04D27/02 (EP);
F04D29/18 (US);
G01F1/34 (US);
G06F17/18 (US);
G08B21/18 (US);
F05D2260/80 (EP);
F05D2270/101 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWALLVORLÄUFERDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, SCHWALLVORLÄUFERDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2021/37] | English: | SURGING PRECURSOR DETECTING DEVICE, METHOD OF DETECTING SURGING PRECURSOR, AND PROGRAM | [2021/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE PRÉCURSEUR EN HAUSSE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PRÉCURSEUR EN HAUSSE ET PROGRAMME | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 07.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/03] | 29.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - BRIGHT M. M. ET AL, "Stall Precursor Identification in High-Speed Compressor Stages Using Chaotic Time Series Analysis Methods", TRANSACTIONS OF THE ASME: JOURNAL OF TURBOMACHINERY., US, vol. 119, no. 3, doi:10.1115/1.2841148, ISSN 0889-504X, (19970701), pages 491 - 499, URL: http://asmedigitalcollection.asme.org/turbomachinery/article-pdf/119/3/491/5631736/491_1.pdf, (20210602), XP055809643 [X] 16 * page 491 * * page 491, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 492, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 492, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 495, column 2, paragraph 3; figures 3f, 4b,5,6,7 * [A] 3-14 [I] 1,2,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/1.2841148 | by applicant | JP4030490B | JP2014066209 | - TAIJI YAMADA, "Method of Analyzing Chaos", Japan Society for Fuzzy Theory and Intelligent Informatics Journal, (19980000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 827 - 835 |